U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00045
  • Case Name: McLean v. CJ Auto Parts Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 16, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 07, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 19, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Lift Stay - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 03, 2022: [Stay]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 28, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.