U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Lamere v. Ofc. Blanco et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order to Strike - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.