U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wentz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [USCA Memorandum - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.