U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Oblander v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 01, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 06, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 04, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Errata - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 01, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.