U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cr-00065-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Onstad et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.