U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Lozeau v. Briney et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.