U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Richter et al v. AutoZoners, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Stipulation]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 21, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 03, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.