U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Lusby v. Lincare
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 10, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 03, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.