U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Elam
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • October 09, 2024: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Letter - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Letter - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Letter - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.