U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blackwell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 18, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.