U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 18, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.