U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swanson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 10, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.