U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Westbrook
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 28, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 08, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 26, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.