U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castellanos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Remark - MT]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Scheduling Conference ]
  • December 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Status Conference ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.