U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roope
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.