U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Enright et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 17, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 05, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 03, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.