U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rasmussen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 17, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 10, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Letter - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 02, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 29, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.