U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company v. Neesvig et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • November 14, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2022: [Mediation - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 23, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • June 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 04, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.