U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shuler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 02, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 29, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.