U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hiltz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 19, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 26, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 17, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 17, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 16, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.