U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Pisle v. Musselshell County, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 01, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 04, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.