U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 12, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 11, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.