U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Champlin, III
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.