U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. The Spirit Hills Homeowners' Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 15, 2022: [Crossclaim]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Appear]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 27, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 04, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.