U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gayo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.