U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00020
  • Case Name: National Surety Corporation and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Siewert et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Costs Taxed]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 09, 2022: [Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 06, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • April 05, 2022: [Pro Se Registration Form]
  • April 04, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 04, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.