U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00051
  • Case Name: Hernandez v. Bludworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.