U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:05-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Norbury
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 30, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.