U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Parizeau v. Anciaux
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 09, 2023: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • January 05, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 15, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.