U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00021
  • Case Name: U Hanging Seven Ranch, Inc. et al v. ONEOK Elk Creek Pipeline, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 01, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 15, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • May 02, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Remand]
  • March 14, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.