U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meyers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.