U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roman Nose
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.