U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Dagel v. Warden Visser et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 15, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 06, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.