U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Berger v. USF Reddaway, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Appear]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • January 10, 2023: [Settlement Conference - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 27, 2022: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 08, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.