U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Daniels v. Harrington
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 05, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Mail Returned]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 08, 2022: [Mail Returned]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.