U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roeber
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 12, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Summons]
  • March 09, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.