U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:11-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Durnam
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.