U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Grenier v. Briney et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.