U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00027
  • Case Name: King et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 10, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 10, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.