U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Horner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 08, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 04, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 10, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Summons]
  • March 10, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.