U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wick, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 12, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Vacate]
  • September 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.