U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stops
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Transcript - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearing - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Detention - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.