U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:19-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dembowski
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.