U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Acuity Insurance Company v. Quast et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 24, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Interpleader Disbursement Completed (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
  • October 10, 2022: [Sealed Unredacted Document(s) with Personal Identifiers for Disbursing Funds - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sealed Unredacted Document(s) with Personal Identifiers for Disbursing Funds - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Status Report Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Vacate]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 07, 2022: [Vacate]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 01, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Remark]
  • March 22, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Authorizing INterpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
  • March 15, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2022: [Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335]
  • March 14, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 14, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.