U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.