U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00020
  • Case Name: McClanahan v. Salmonsen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Supplement - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Show Cause]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 06, 2023: [Supplement - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 01, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Order - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 20, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Default Judgment - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • July 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 06, 2022: [Default Judgment - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Entry of Default]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 16, 2022: [Objection to Non-Dispositive Order - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.