U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00021
  • Case Name: County of Powell v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • December 28, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2022: [Vacate]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Intervene]
  • July 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 23, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 23, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 21, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 16, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.