U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Howard et al v. Todd et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Status Report]
  • July 13, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 18, 2022: [Stipulation and Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 16, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 16, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.