U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Anderson & Liechty, P.C. et al v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Vacate]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 05, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.