U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Hartman v. Knudsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • September 12, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
  • September 01, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Remark]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.